This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 00:46:33 (UTC).

LEI ZHANG VS TRIO PASADENA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 LEI ZHANG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRIO PASADENA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9180

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZHANG LEI

Defendants

GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TRIO PASADENA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GREYSTAR CALIFORNIA INC.

TRIO PASADENA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHY KENNETH R.

Defendant Attorney

BRUMFIEL CHRISTOPHER E

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/20/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/20/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC AND GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LP WITHOUT PREJUDICE

10/12/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC AND GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LP WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/12/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

11/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

11/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

11/29/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

12/9/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Refund / Order

1/12/2022: Request for Refund / Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Hearing07/06/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by TRIO PASADENA, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by TRIO PASADENA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); GREYSTAR CALIFORNIA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TRIO PASADENA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); GREYSTAR CALIFORNIA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lei Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Lei Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TRIO PASADENA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by TRIO PASADENA, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Lei Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lei Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lei Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lei Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lei Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lei Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIO PASADENA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Greystar California Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES LP AS MANAGER FOR JTB APTS is a litigant