This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2022 at 15:40:23 (UTC).

LEGGETT, STALACIA VS PEARSON, KAITLIN

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 LEGGETT, STALACIA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against PEARSON, KAITLIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SKEBA, VALERIE L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1014

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SKEBA, VALERIE L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEGGETT STALACIA

Respondent

PEARSON KAITLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HERRERA ALEJANDRO H.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

8/17/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Petition - Civil Harassment

8/17/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - DENIED

8/17/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - DENIED

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

8/17/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Minute Order

9/8/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/8/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

9/16/2021: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

9/8/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Substitution of Attorney - **Pro Se Out/Counsel In**

9/16/2021: Substitution of Attorney - **Pro Se Out/Counsel In**

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

9/16/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Skeba, Valerie L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (**Pro Se Out/Counsel In** ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Skeba, Valerie L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (DENIED ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less