This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 07:03:42 (UTC).

LE'ELDRED PALM, SR. VS RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 LE'ELDRED PALM, SR filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7929

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

PALM LE'ELDRED SR.

Appellant and Defendant

RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC

Defendants

GAGNON ROBERT

RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC

WALLER MICHAEL

Not Classified By Court

GUERRA SANDRA

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC.

SAMPLES ROSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PERSOFF JOSEPH

FARAG SHAREEF

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/28/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/28/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING) OF 06/08/2020

6/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING) OF 06/08/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)

6/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)

Case Management Statement

6/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION(S) FILED DURING ...)

6/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION(S) FILED DURING ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION(S) FILED DURING ...) OF 06/05/2020

6/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION(S) FILED DURING ...) OF 06/05/2020

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHAREEF S. FARAG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/4/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHAREEF S. FARAG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/4/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/8/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FILED DURING THE...)

7/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FILED DURING THE...)

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • Hearing05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Hearing); Filed by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Status Conference (Re Appeal) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appeal; Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Le'Eldred Palm, Sr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Hearing on Motion(s) Filed During ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Hearing on Motion(s) Filed During ...) of 06/05/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Defendant); Michael Waller (Defendant); Robert Gagnon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Shareef S. Farag in support of Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Defendant); Michael Waller (Defendant); Robert Gagnon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Le'Eldred Palm, Sr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Le'Eldred Palm, Sr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV07929    Hearing Date: January 28, 2021    Dept: 73

1/28/2021

Dept. 73

Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding

LE’ELDRED PALM SR. v. RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC, et. al. (20STCV07929)

Counsel for Plaintiff/opposing party: None. (Self-represented)

Counsel for Defendants/moving parties: Shareef Farag, Joseph Persoff (Baker & Hostetler LLP)

RED LOBSTER’S MOTION for award of attorneys’ fees and costs (filed 11/23/2020)

TENTATIVE RULING

The motion is unopposed. However, moving party Red Lobster has filed and perfected an appeal of the court’s order. Further, on 12/11/2020 the court stayed the entire action at defendant’s request. The Plaintiff, who is self-represented and not an attorney, may have assumed the fee motion would not be heard and opted not to file opposition. While the court arguably may have jurisdiction to hear the motion at this time ( See Robertson v. Rodriguez (1995) 36 Cal. App. 4th 347, 360), the court orders the motion continued with notice given to Plaintiff that the motion for fees will be heard at the continued date and that any opposition must be filed and served in compliance with CCP §1005(b). Alternatively, moving party may take the motion off-calendar without prejudice to re-noticing the motion at the conclusion of the appeal.

Unless taken off-calendar, the continued date is: ___________________.

Notice of ruling by moving party.

Case Number: 20STCV07929    Hearing Date: October 05, 2020    Dept: 73

10/5/2020Dept. 73Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presidingLe'Eldred Palm, Sr. vs. Red Lobster, etc. (20STCV07929)TENTATIVE RULING:None.  The court will hear argument and take the matters under submission.  

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERSOFF JOSEPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARAG SHAREEF