This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 15:09:52 (UTC).

LEE WEISSMANN VS ESPN LA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 LEE WEISSMANN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ESPN LA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, AMY D. HOGUE, DAVID J. COWAN, ELIHU M. BERLE and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8316

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

AMY D. HOGUE

DAVID J. COWAN

ELIHU M. BERLE

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEISSMANN LEE

Defendants

ABC RADIO LOS ANGELES ASSETS LLC

DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC.

ESPN LA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SELIK EVAN

ZAOUK CHRISTINE CHALHOUB

Defendant Attorney

BERTRAND RAYMOND

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/3/2021: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

8/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (CRC RULE 3.728)

8/6/2021: Case Management Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (CRC RULE 3.728)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE ZAOUK IN SUPPORT

8/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE ZAOUK IN SUPPORT

Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR ORDER GRANTING RELIEF

8/10/2021: Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR ORDER GRANTING RELIEF

Notice of Ruling

8/10/2021: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE ZAOUK IN SUPPORT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL

9/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE ZAOUK IN SUPPORT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE ZAOUK IN SUPPORT

9/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE ZAOUK IN SUPPORT

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

9/15/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Order - ORDER PROPOSED

9/16/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR...)

9/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR...)

Notice of Ruling

9/27/2021: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

7/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

8/5/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PROOFS OF SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANTS, ESPN LA, DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES, INC., AND ABC RADIO LOS ANGELES ASSETS, LLC

5/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PROOFS OF SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANTS, ESPN LA, DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES, INC., AND ABC RADIO LOS ANGELES ASSETS, LLC

Answer

4/19/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • Hearing07/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • Hearing07/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other Granting Relief from Waiver of Jury Trial; Filed by Plaintiff Lee Weissmann;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Lee Weissmann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketOrder (Proposed); Filed by Lee Weissmann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES); Filed by Lee Weissmann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF CHRISTINE ZAOUK IN SUPPORT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL); Filed by Lee Weissmann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Christine Zaouk in Support); Filed by Lee Weissmann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Case Reassignment;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Case Reassignment;) of 03/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docketat 07:24 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 03/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Lee Weissmann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lee Weissmann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lee Weissmann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISNEY WORLDWIDE SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SELIK EVAN MATTHEW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAOUK CHRISTINE CHALHOUB