This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2022 at 12:27:34 (UTC).

LEE, BRENDA VS CHOI, HYEMIN

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 LEE, BRENDA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against CHOI, HYEMIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WARREN, JEANMARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2076

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WARREN, JEANMARIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEE BRENDA

Respondent

CHOI HYEMIN

 

Court Documents

Petition - Civil Harassment (violence)

9/27/2022: Petition - Civil Harassment (violence)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/27/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9/27/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Proof of Service

10/12/2022: Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Mail

10/18/2022: Proof of Service - Mail

Response - Civil Harassment (violence)

10/18/2022: Response - Civil Harassment (violence)

Substitution of Attorney

10/18/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

10/18/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

10/18/2022: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

11/8/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

11/8/2022: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S11, Warren, Jeanmarie, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S11, Warren, Jeanmarie, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment (violence); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less