This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 01:17:25 (UTC).

LEANNE CURTIS ET AL VS LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/23/2018 LEANNE CURTIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, MARK A. BORENSTEIN, YOLANDA OROZCO and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5337

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

YOLANDA OROZCO

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

CURTIS MICHAEL

CURTIS LEANNE

Respondents and Defendants

LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC.

SET MEDICS LLC

DOES 1 TO 100

3780 WILTERN CENTER LLC

SIX TO EIGHT INC. [DOE 1]

SIX TO EIGHT INC.[DOE 1]

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

AGNEW GERALD E. JR. ESQ.

HOLDREN KENNETH ALEXANDER ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

COHEN JORDAN G.

WALKER KATHLEEN M. ESQ.

CITRON THOMAS HARVEY

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

ELDER BRAD MACLEAN ESQ.

JENKINS MICHAEL

JENKINS MICHAEL E

JENKINS MICHAEL E.

CITRON THOMAS HARVEY ESQ.

WALKER KATHLEEN MARIE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT 3780 WILTERN CENTER, LLC

7/30/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT 3780 WILTERN CENTER, LLC

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

8/2/2021: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/17/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT SIX TO EIGHT, INC. TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION O

2/25/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT SIX TO EIGHT, INC. TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION O

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING DEFENDANT SIX TO EIGHT, INC.'S EX PARTE FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES WAS GRANTED

2/26/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING DEFENDANT SIX TO EIGHT, INC.'S EX PARTE FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES WAS GRANTED

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL REL...)

2/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL REL...)

Substitution of Attorney

11/24/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Ruling

8/5/2020: Notice of Ruling

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE TO APRIL 19, 2021 AND CONTINUE ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES

7/22/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE TO APRIL 19, 2021 AND CONTINUE ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/28/2020

7/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/28/2020

Association of Attorney

5/29/2020: Association of Attorney

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/12/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/21/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS / TRIAL DATES

2/26/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS / TRIAL DATES

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Hearing02/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Leanne Curtis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Leanne Curtis (Plaintiff); Michael Curtis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT 3780 WILTERN CENTER, LLC); Filed by Live Nation Entertainment Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Leanne Curtis (Plaintiff); Michael Curtis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Leanne Curtis (Plaintiff); Michael Curtis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Leanne Curtis (Plaintiff); Michael Curtis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leanne Curtis (Plaintiff); Michael Curtis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695337    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the CENTRAL DISTRICT, LOS ANGELES, JUDGE T. BEAUDET presiding in Department 50 for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3780 WILTERN CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALKER KATHLEEN M. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENKINS MICHAEL EDWIN