Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2021 at 19:10:55 (UTC).

LEAH KILPATRICK VS HILLSTONE RESTAURANT GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 LEAH KILPATRICK filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HILLSTONE RESTAURANT GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0450

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KILPATRICK LEAH

Defendant

HILLSTONE RESTAURANT GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRYANNE J

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/26/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/21/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) (DEFENDANT)

4/9/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) (DEFENDANT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/12/2021

4/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/12/2021

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/9/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • Hearing09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hillstone Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Leah Kilpatrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) ((Defendant)); Filed by Hillstone Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Leah Kilpatrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Leah Kilpatrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Leah Kilpatrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Leah Kilpatrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leah Kilpatrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HILLSTONE RESTARAUNT GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS BRYANNE JOHNE