This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2021 at 05:03:08 (UTC).

L.D. HOWARD VS FH & HF-TORRANCE I, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 L D HOWARD filed an Other lawsuit against FH HF-TORRANCE I, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6391

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOWARD L.D.

Defendants

FAMILY HEALTH & HOUSING FOUNDATION-TORRANCE I LLC

FH & HF-TORRANCE I LLC

FAMILY HEALTH AND HOUSING FOUNDATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

3/30/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

3/30/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

3/30/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Motion for Trial Preference

4/14/2021: Motion for Trial Preference

Request for Dismissal

4/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by L.D. Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMotion for Trial Preference; Filed by L.D. Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by L.D. Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by L.D. Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by L.D. Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by L.D. Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by L.D. Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by L.D. Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by L.D. Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAMILY HEALTH AND HOUSING FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL