This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 00:50:05 (UTC).

LAZICH, CALEB CASSADY - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 LAZICH, CALEB CASSADY - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5606

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WRIGHT FABIOLA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FINK ROBERT S.

Other Attorneys

PRICE DAVID MACGREGOR

 

Court Documents

Declaration - UCCJEA

6/7/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Notification - Cons/Guard Address - Notification - Cons/Guard Address

6/7/2021: Notification - Cons/Guard Address - Notification - Cons/Guard Address

Consent

6/7/2021: Consent

Petition - Appoint Guardian of P&E (Initial)

6/7/2021: Petition - Appoint Guardian of P&E (Initial)

Order - Prescribing Notice

6/7/2021: Order - Prescribing Notice

Letters - Temporary

6/16/2021: Letters - Temporary

Order - Appointing Temporary Guardian - AMENDED Order. Person only granted to 9/28/2021

6/16/2021: Order - Appointing Temporary Guardian - AMENDED Order. Person only granted to 9/28/2021

Ex Parte - Order

6/11/2021: Ex Parte - Order

Ex Parte - Petition to Appoint Temporary Guardian - (Appearing On 06/10/2021).

6/9/2021: Ex Parte - Petition to Appoint Temporary Guardian - (Appearing On 06/10/2021).

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

6/9/2021: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Duties of Guardian

6/9/2021: Duties of Guardian

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel

9/22/2021: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel

PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

9/14/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

Order - Appointing Counsel

9/14/2021: Order - Appointing Counsel

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

9/9/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Notice - Hearing

9/8/2021: Notice - Hearing

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 11:00 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketReport - Court Appointed Counsel (Report ??? Court Appointed Counsel ); Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCAC Appointment Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketLetters - Temporary; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Temporary Guardian (AMENDED Order. Person only granted to 9/28/2021 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition to Appoint Temporary Guardian ((Appearing On 06/10/2021). ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDuties of Guardian; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketConsent; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Guardian of P&E (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address (Notification - Cons/Guard Address ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOrder - Prescribing Notice; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRICE DAVID MACGREGOR