Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 12:12:05 (UTC).

LAY TAING, ET AL. VS EMILY ANN ISEMINGER, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ISEMINGER FAMILY TRUST DATED JULY 21, 1987, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 LAY TAING filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against EMILY ANN ISEMINGER, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ISEMINGER FAMILY TRUST DATED JULY 21, 1987. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0614

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAING LAY

TAING LEAN HU

Defendants

ROMERO TRINIDAD

ISEMINGER SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ISEMINGER FAMILY TRUST

ROMERO MARTHA ELENA

D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES

TAKIS GEORGE

ISEMINGER EMILY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POTIER AMANDA J.

Defendant Attorneys

KLIER-ERLICH RINAT B.

CARLONI DIANA J

CARLONI DIANA JEAN

MARINO ANTOINETTE MARIE

KLIER-ERLICH RINAT

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

5/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

Substitution of Attorney

4/28/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

5/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

2/10/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

2/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

1/19/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/13/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/2/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/30/2020: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 2:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (Recorded Notice of Pending Action); Filed by Lay Taing (Plaintiff); Lean Hu Taing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by George Takis (Defendant); D'amico Palos Verdes Realty, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Emily Ann Iseminger, Successor Trustee of the Iseminger Family Trust Dated July 21, 1987 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by D'amico Palos Verdes Realty, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by George Takis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Lay Taing (Plaintiff); Lean Hu Taing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lay Taing (Plaintiff); Lean Hu Taing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Lay Taing (Plaintiff); Lean Hu Taing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Lay Taing (Plaintiff); Lean Hu Taing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lay Taing (Plaintiff); Lean Hu Taing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lay Taing (Plaintiff); Lean Hu Taing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lay Taing (Plaintiff); Lean Hu Taing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lay Taing (Plaintiff); Lean Hu Taing (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D'AMICO PALOS VERDES REALTY INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PALOS VERDES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POTIER AMANDA J ESQ