This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2023 at 01:46:00 (UTC).

LAX, ELINOR - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 LAX, ELINOR - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PRIVER, MARK S. and BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2723

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PRIVER, MARK S.

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JENKINS NEDRA

Conservator

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Not Classified By Court

LAX ELINOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JENKINS NEDRA

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LEBOWSKY LAWRENCE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial)

12/21/2022: Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial)

Citation - Issued

12/21/2022: Citation - Issued

PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

12/28/2022: PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

Order - Appointing Counsel

12/28/2022: Order - Appointing Counsel

Citation - served- Citation

1/17/2023: Citation - served- Citation

Notice - Hearing

2/2/2023: Notice - Hearing

Doctor's Capacity Declaration - CAPACITY DECLARATION

2/21/2023: Doctor's Capacity Declaration - CAPACITY DECLARATION

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report Court Appointed Counsel

2/28/2023: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report Court Appointed Counsel

Minute Order

3/1/2023: Minute Order

Supplement - 5/30/23

3/30/2023: Supplement - 5/30/23

Doctor's Capacity Declaration

5/24/2023: Doctor's Capacity Declaration

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Second Report of Court Appointed Counsel on Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator

5/30/2023: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Second Report of Court Appointed Counsel on Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator

Minute Order

5/30/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/2/2023: Minute Order

Order - Appointing Conservator

8/4/2023: Order - Appointing Conservator

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2024
  • Hearing07/02/2024 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • Hearing08/18/2023 at 10:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Conservator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketCourt's Notice of Conservatee's Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Priver, Mark S., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Conservator - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketConservatorship Appointment Petition Granted (Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial) filed on December 21, 2022 by Nedra Jenkins. )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketReport - Court Appointed Counsel (Second Report of Court Appointed Counsel on Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator ); Filed by Subject

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration (CAPACITY DECLARATION ); Filed by Conservator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Conservator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCitation (served- Citation ); Filed by Conservator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCitation (Issued ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less