Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 08:42:38 (UTC).

LAWSON, BEVERLY J - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 LAWSON, BEVERLY J - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1480

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BUNZY LUCY

Decedent

LAWSON BEVERLY J

Other

LAWSON DINO

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/15/2021: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Probate

6/15/2021: Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Probate

Minute Order

4/5/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

3/11/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

2/18/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

2/18/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • Hearing09/27/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Heir

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement to Petition for Probate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Heir

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (Request to Waive Court Fees ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less