This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 09:29:24 (UTC).

LAWRENCE WHITE VS JAYCEON TERRELL TAYLOR ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 LAWRENCE WHITE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JAYCEON TERRELL TAYLOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7815

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

WHITE LAWRENCE

Claimant

NOVIAN & NOVIAN LLP

Respondents and Defendants

TAYLOR JAYCEON TERRELL

THE GAME

JTT HOLDING LLC

DOES 1 TO 25

TAYLOR JAYCEON TERRELL AKA THE GAME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

NOVIAN FARHAD ESQ.

Claimant Attorney

NOVIAN FARHAD

 

Court Documents

Unknown

4/10/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE

4/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/25/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/3/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF LIEN

5/10/2018: NOTICE OF LIEN

NOTICE OF RULING

5/16/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/31/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

8/1/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/15/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/25/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/20/2019: Minute Order

RECORDED NOTICE OF ACTION PENDING AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL PRIOR TO RECORDATION [CCP 405.20]

1/9/2018: RECORDED NOTICE OF ACTION PENDING AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL PRIOR TO RECORDATION [CCP 405.20]

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/9/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

1/17/2018: Unknown

SUMMONS

12/20/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CREDITOR'S SUIT ;ETC

12/20/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CREDITOR'S SUIT ;ETC

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of 05/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; OSC Re: Entry of Default; OSC Re:...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Lawrence White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Lawrence White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Lawrence White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • RECORDED NOTICE OF ACTION PENDING AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL PRIOR TO RECORDATION [CCP 405.20]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Lawrence White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CREDITOR'S SUIT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Lawrence White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

FARHAD NOVIAN (SBN 118129)

JONATHAN A. SCHAUB (SBN 298892) NOVIAN & NOVIAN, LLP

1801 Century Park East, Suite 1201 . FILED s Los Angeles, California 90067 &,umy of Los Angeles Telephone: (310) 553-1222

Facsimile: (310) 553-0222 DEC 20 2011

' Sherr icer/Clerk Attorneys for Plaintiff Lawrence White By Deputy n Gomez

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

LAWRENCE WHITE, an individual, CASE NO.: B C 6 8 ? 8 1 5 Plaintiff, COMPLAINT FOR: Vs. 1. CREDITOR’S SUIT JAYCEON TERRELL TAYLOR, an 2. SETTING ASIDE FRAUDULENT individual a’k/a THE GAME,; JTT TRANSFERS AND DAMAGES

HOLDINGS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company; and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive, | 3. ALTER EGO LIABILITY

Defendants.

Plaintiff LAWRENCE WHITE, an individual (“Plaintiff”’), hereby complains against defendants JAYCEON TERRELL TAYLOR, an individual also known as THE GAME (“Taylor”), JTT HOLDINGS, LLC (“JTT Holdings™), a Nevada limited liability company, and DOES 1 through 23, inclusive, and alleges as follows:

PARTIES

1. i’laintiff is an individual who at all relevant times was a resident of the County of Los Angeles, State of California. | 2. Plaintiff 1s informed and believes and based thereon alleges that Taylor is, and at all

times relevant herein was, a resident of the County of Los Angeles, State of California.

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC687815    Hearing Date: October 20, 2020    Dept: 19

The Court is prepared to grant the Motion to Be Relieved As Counsel.  However, the proposed order fails to provide the last know zip code or telephone number for Lawrence White.  Moving party must provide that information to the Court at the hearing, or the motion will be continued.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOVIAN & NOVIAN LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVIAN FARHAD