This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 05:25:22 (UTC).

LAWRENCE DIESS ET AL VS BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC ET

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 LAWRENCE DIESS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3139

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DIESS CAROL

DIESS LAWRENCE

Defendants and Respondents

MSD CONSUMER CARE INC

BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC

BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC

BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC

MINERAL PIGMENTT SOLUTIONS INC

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

DOES 1-450

CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY

SHULTON INC.

DR. SCHOLL'S LLC

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC.

WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS INC.

MERCK & CO. INC.

IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC.

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BARTLETT JENNIFER L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/11/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

11/19/2018: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

12/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

2/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice

2/15/2019: Notice

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

4/29/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE; STRICT LIABILITY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM)

5/30/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE; STRICT LIABILITY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM)

SUMMONS

5/30/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

5/30/2017: Unknown

Answer

7/13/2017: Answer

Answer

7/14/2017: Answer

Answer

7/14/2017: Answer

Answer

7/20/2017: Answer

Other -

7/20/2017: Other -

Notice

9/21/2017: Notice

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (Defendant); JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court (and Notice To State Court Clerk and Adverse Parties); Filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (Defendant); JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department Legacy; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Notice (of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings); Filed by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Lawrence Diess (Plaintiff); Carol Diess (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2017
  • Notice WHITTAICER, CLARK & DANIELS, INC.'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SIGNED DECLARATION OF DENNIS ST. GEORGE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH; PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • -DEFENDANT WHITTAKER, CLARK & DANIELS, INC.'S ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Answer -DEFENDANT WYETH HOLDING, LLC,S AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS; JURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Answer -DEFENDANT THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS; JURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Answer -DEFENDANT SHULTON, INC. COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY --ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE; STRICT LIABILITY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM); JURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Answer -DEFENDANT WYETH HOLDINGS, LLC, F/IC/A WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION, F/K/A AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Lawrence Diess (Plaintiff); Carol Diess (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE; STRICT LIABILITY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSD Consumer Care Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DR. SCHOLL'S LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC, F/K/A BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC F/K/A MSD CONSUMER CARE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCK & CO. INC. is a litigant