This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2020 at 02:21:32 (UTC).

LAWRENCE BENNETT VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 LAWRENCE BENNETT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4632

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BENNETT LAWRENCE

Defendants and Respondents

601 SHARON LLC

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BRAL S. SEAN ESQ.

BRAL S. SEAN

Defendant Attorneys

SAWAF SIREEN

POULADIAN VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/24/2020

9/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/24/2020

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VANESSA POULADIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, 601 SHARON, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VANESSA POULADIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, 601 SHARON, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VANESSA POULADIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, 601 SHARON, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VANESSA POULADIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, 601 SHARON, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/21/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING OF HEARINGS DUE TO COVID-19;)

9/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING OF HEARINGS DUE TO COVID-19;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING OF HEARINGS DUE TO COVID-19;) OF 09/02/2020

9/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING OF HEARINGS DUE TO COVID-19;) OF 09/02/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

2/3/2020: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

2/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Motion to Continue Trial Date

2/13/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

12/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Notice of Ruling

12/6/2019: Notice of Ruling

Answer

11/1/2019: Answer

Request for Dismissal

11/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

10/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

10/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

SUMMONS -

5/1/2018: SUMMONS -

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • Hearing03/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Prosecute) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docketat 09:04 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 09/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Lawrence Bennett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by 601 Sharon LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 09:50 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Rescheduling of Hearings due to Covid-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Rescheduling of Hearings due to Covid-19;) of 09/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lawrence Bennett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lawrence Bennett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lawrence Bennett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Lawrence Bennett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLTGENCEIDANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY (GOV. CODE 815, ET SEQ.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lawrence Bennett (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704632    Hearing Date: March 16, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

LAWRENCE BENNETT,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC704632

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 16, 2020

Plaintiff, Lawrence Bennett filed this action against Defendants, County of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, and 601 Sharon, LLC for damages arising out of a slip and fall. Plaintiff filed the complaint on 5/01/18, but did not file proof of service of the summons and complaint on Defendants until October of 2019. 601 Sharon appeared via answer on 11/01/19.

At this time, 601 Sharon moves to continue the trial date from 5/21/20 for approximately six months. It adequately shows good cause for the continuance in light of Plaintiff’s failure to serve it (and the other defendants) for a year and five months after filing the complaint.

The motion to continue the trial date is unopposed and granted. The 5/21/20 trial date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Tuesday, 11/10/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 31 of the Spring Street Courthouse. The 5/06/20 FSC date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Tuesday, 10/2720 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 31. All discovery and expert cut-off dates are continued to reflect the new trial date.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Dated this 16th day of March, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC704632    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

LAWRENCE BENNETT,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC704632

[TENTATIVE] ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 5, 2019

Plaintiff, Lawrence Bennett filed this action against Defendants, County of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, and 601 Sharon, LLC for damages arising out of a trip and fall. Plaintiff has dismissed the County from the complaint, and the City and Sharon remain as defendants at this time.

The City demurs to the complaint, contending the complaint is barred by the statute of limitations. The facts relating to the filing of the complaint are not in dispute. Plaintiff was injured on 3/03/17. He timely filed his government tort claim on 5/08/17. On 7/05/17, the City denied the claim. Plaintiff filed his complaint on 5/01/18.

If a public entity rejects a government tort claim, the claimant has six months from the date the rejection was deposited in the mail to file suit. Gov Code §§945.6, 915.2. Six months after 7/05/17 ran on or about 1/05/18. Plaintiff did not file suit until 5/01/18, almost four months too late.

The demurrer is sustained on the ground that Plaintiff’s complaint is barred by the statute of limitations. Notably, any opposition to the demurrer was due on or before 11/20/19; the Court has not received an opposition to the demurrer. Also notably, Defense Counsel declares he made three attempts to meet and confer prior to filing the demurrer, and Plaintiff’s attorney did not respond to any of the three attempts. The Court asks Plaintiff’s attorney to actively engage in the required meet and confer process in the future in connection with this and other actions. In light of the lack of opposition to the demurrer, leave to amend is denied.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.