This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2021 at 01:25:30 (UTC).

LAW OFFICES OF ROGER C. HSU VS LIU YI

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 LAW OFFICES OF ROGER C HSU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LIU YI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7887

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAW OFFICES OF ROGER C. HSU

Defendant

YI LIU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HSU ROGER C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/12/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/18/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Case Management Statement

7/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GURGEN SARGSYAN

7/26/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GURGEN SARGSYAN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

8/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GURGEN SARGSYAN

10/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GURGEN SARGSYAN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

10/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Application for Publication

11/2/2021: Application for Publication

Case Management Statement

10/26/2021: Case Management Statement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • Hearing11/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Hearing11/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by Law Offices of Roger C. Hsu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Law Offices of Roger C. Hsu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Gurgen Sargsyan); Filed by Law Offices of Roger C. Hsu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF GURGEN SARGSYAN); Filed by Law Offices of Roger C. Hsu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Law Offices of Roger C. Hsu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Law Offices of Roger C. Hsu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Law Offices of Roger C. Hsu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Law Offices of Roger C. Hsu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Law Offices of Roger C. Hsu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HSU ROGER C.