Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 06:30:09 (UTC).

LAW OFFICES OF NICO N. TABIBI, APC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS HAYM AFTALION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 LAW OFFICES OF NICO N TABIBI, APC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HAYM AFTALION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6363

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAW OFFICES OF NICO N. TABIBI APC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

401 E. 7TH STREET LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AFTALION HAYM

AFTALION MITRA

AFTALION JELA

AFTALION LEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TABIBI NICO N.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2020: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

8/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

9/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Law Offices of Nico N. Tabibi, APC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TABIBI NICO N.