This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 21:18:09 (UTC).

LAVI B. HAMO VS 91 ENTERPRISE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 LAVI B HAMO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 91 ENTERPRISE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7498

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HAMO LAVI B.

HAMO LAVI BEN

Defendants

91 ENTERPRISE LLC

DAVID ALON BEN

ELIMELEH ASHER

ERLICH GILAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMIN PARAG L.

SEGAL ROBERT M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/29/2021

9/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/29/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

9/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE...)

11/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE...) OF 11/19/2021

11/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE...) OF 11/19/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION RE FAILURE TO SERVE COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANTS

11/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION RE FAILURE TO SERVE COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION AN...)

11/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION AN...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION AND THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF STATE

11/16/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION AND THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF STATE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • Hearing02/16/2022 at 10:35 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (reDismissal for Failure to Serve Complaint) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal for Failure to Serve...) of 11/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal for Failure to Serve...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (RE Failure to Serve Complaint On Defendants); Filed by Lavi Ben Hamo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Service by Publication and through the Secretary of State) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Service by Publication and through the Secretary of State) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Service by Publication an...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Service by Publication and through the Secretary of State); Filed by Lavi Ben Hamo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 09:47 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 09/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lavi Ben Hamo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lavi Ben Hamo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lavi Ben Hamo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 91 ENTERPRISE LLC. DBA BRILLIANCE NEW YORK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIN PARAG L.