This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 03:55:55 (UTC).

LAVELLE STEWART VS MARTIN LUTHER KING JR.-LOS ANGELES (MLK-LA) HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, A NON-PROFIT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 LAVELLE STEWART filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MARTIN LUTHER KING JR -LOS ANGELES MLK-LA HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, A NON-PROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6270

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEWART LAVELLE

Defendants

WEI-MESTER M.D. SINDY HSIN-PEN

MARTIN LUTHER KING JR.-LOS ANGELES MLK-LA HEALTHCARE CORPORATION A NON-PROFIT CORPORATION DBA MARTIN LUTHER KING JR. COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

WASHINGTON M.D. COURTNEY

MARTIN LUTHER KING JR. COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARROTTO GREG

Defendant Attorneys

DIAMOND SCOTT RORY

IRWIN GABRIEL MARSH

DAEHNKE PATRICIA EGAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT

11/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT

Separate Statement

11/29/2021: Separate Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/29/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Motion for Summary Judgment

11/29/2021: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID BARCAY, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF COURTNEY WASHINGTON, M.D.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID BARCAY, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF COURTNEY WASHINGTON, M.D.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Motion for Summary Judgment

12/8/2021: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

12/8/2021: Separate Statement

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEFENDANT COURTNEY WASHINGTON, M.D.S NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT COURTNEY WASHINGTON, M.D.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/8/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEFENDANT COURTNEY WASHINGTON, M.D.S NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT COURTNEY WASHINGTON, M.D.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1/31/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer

12/4/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/4/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

12/7/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/26/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA

10/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA

Demand for Jury Trial

10/20/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/20/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/20/2020: Answer

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2023
  • Hearing09/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • Hearing03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Hearing02/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • Hearing10/19/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Lavelle Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (DEFENDANT COURTNEY WASHINGTON, M.D.?S NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT COURTNEY WASHINGTON, M.D.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT); Filed by Courtney Washington M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Martin Luther King, Jr. Community Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Martin Luther King, Jr. Community Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Martin Luther King, Jr. Community Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lavelle Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lavelle Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lavelle Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lavelle Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTIN LUTHER KING JR. COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where MARTIN LUTHER KING JR.-LOS ANGELES MLK-LA HEALTHCARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARROTTO GREG