This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2022 at 03:47:00 (UTC).

LAVELLE, NATHAN - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 LAVELLE, NATHAN - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAY, GUS T. and PRIVER, MARK S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4959

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAY, GUS T.

PRIVER, MARK S.

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Interested Parties

LAVELLE ALEXANDREA

LAVELLE LORNA

Claimant

STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

Respondents

C&H TRUST DEED SERVICE

THE REO GROUP INC.

Decedent

LAVELLE NATHAN

Not Classified By Court

GUTIERREZ RUBEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Interested Party Attorneys

BUTLER L'TANYA MATILDE

GORDON JUSTIN M.

Respondent Attorney

HALAVAIS COBY RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Reply - Reply to Opposition to OSC Re: Preliminary Injuction

10/12/2021: Reply - Reply to Opposition to OSC Re: Preliminary Injuction

Minute Order

6/28/2022: Minute Order

Miscellaneous Document - Final Closing Statement

6/7/2022: Miscellaneous Document - Final Closing Statement

Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

6/7/2022: Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

Proof of Publication

9/9/2021: Proof of Publication

Declaration - of Notice

9/15/2021: Declaration - of Notice

Declaration - Declaration

9/15/2021: Declaration - Declaration

Declaration - of Atty

9/15/2021: Declaration - of Atty

Petition - Authority - for Injunction and for Order Protecting Estate Real Property from Claim of Creditor

9/15/2021: Petition - Authority - for Injunction and for Order Protecting Estate Real Property from Claim of Creditor

Declaration - of Co-Administrator

9/15/2021: Declaration - of Co-Administrator

Ex Parte - Petition ($200.00) - (09/16/2021) TRO/Preliminary Injunction

9/15/2021: Ex Parte - Petition ($200.00) - (09/16/2021) TRO/Preliminary Injunction

Ex Parte - Opposition ($200) - to TRO

9/15/2021: Ex Parte - Opposition ($200) - to TRO

Notice - Notice of errata

9/15/2021: Notice - Notice of errata

Declaration

9/15/2021: Declaration

Supplement - Supplement

9/15/2021: Supplement - Supplement

Ex Parte - Order

9/17/2021: Ex Parte - Order

Proof of Publication

9/28/2021: Proof of Publication

Declaration - Errata to Declaration of Halavais

10/1/2021: Declaration - Errata to Declaration of Halavais

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketReceipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document (Final Closing Statement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, Priver, Mark S., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, Priver, Mark S., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
128 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Order (Appointing Special Administrator )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition ($200.00) ((Appearing 8/13/2020) Petition for Special Letters of Administration without General Powers (Subsequent) ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Order (Denied )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition (Petition for Special Letters of Administration with General Powers -- Appearing 8/7/2020 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration Re: Notice ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REO GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where C & H TRUST DEED SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALAVAIS COBY RICHARD