This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2023 at 07:35:35 (UTC).

LAURO ESTEFAN, VS BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 LAURO ESTEFAN, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BOWMAN PLATING CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN, WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5323

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTEFAN LAURO

Defendant

BOWMAN PLATING CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

KRUEGER WESLEY A

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

6/2/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/24/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; HEARING ON MOTION TO...)

4/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; HEARING ON MOTION TO...)

Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS PAGA COMPLAINT

4/24/2023: Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS PAGA COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFANS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PLAINTIFFS PAGA ACTION

4/19/2023: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFANS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PLAINTIFFS PAGA ACTION

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASSES

4/18/2023: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASSES

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFAN'S PAGA ACTION

4/7/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFAN'S PAGA ACTION

Exhibit List - COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/13/2023: Exhibit List - COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHIVA RAZIPOUR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

3/13/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHIVA RAZIPOUR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Motion to Consolidate - DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS FOR ALL PURPOSES

3/13/2023: Motion to Consolidate - DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS FOR ALL PURPOSES

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/13/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Judicial Notice - JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

3/13/2023: Request for Judicial Notice - JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHIVA RAZIPOUR IN SUPPORT OF BOWMAN PLATINGS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/13/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHIVA RAZIPOUR IN SUPPORT OF BOWMAN PLATINGS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRAD SIMPSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/13/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRAD SIMPSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/13/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFANS PAGA ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

3/13/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFANS PAGA ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/20/2023

1/20/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/20/2023

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Defendant Bowman Plating, Co., Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Lauro Estefans PAGA Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities: Filed By: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 04/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Defendant Bowman Plating, Co., Inc.s Motion to Consolidate Related Actions for all Purposes: Filed By: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 04/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Defendant Bowman Plating Co., Inc.s Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs PAGA Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Lauro Estefan, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Hearing on Motion to...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV28550, and 22STCV35323 consolidated; case number 22STCV28550 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 updated: Result Date to 04/24/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Consolidate scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 updated: Result Date to 04/24/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. David J. Cowan; Reason: Deemed Non-Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lauro Estefan, (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lauro Estefan, (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lauro Estefan, (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less