This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 13:32:11 (UTC).

LAURO ESTEFAN, VS BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 LAURO ESTEFAN, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BOWMAN PLATING CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5323

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTEFAN LAURO

Defendant

BOWMAN PLATING CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/7/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 11/15/2022

11/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 11/15/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

11/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 11/30/2022

11/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 11/30/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

11/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Notice - NOTICE OF NON COMPLEX DETERMINATION AND REASSIGNMENT

12/30/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF NON COMPLEX DETERMINATION AND REASSIGNMENT

Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Lauro Estefan, (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 12/27/2022; Service Cost: 145.71; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Non Complex Determination and Reassignment; Filed by: Lauro Estefan, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Compton Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Michael Shultz; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 11/30/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Non--Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of 11/15/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. David J. Cowan; Reason: Deemed Non-Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lauro Estefan, (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lauro Estefan, (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lauro Estefan, (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWMAN PLATING CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHONEY KEVIN