This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 07:02:15 (UTC).

LAURO ESTEFAN VS BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 LAURO ESTEFAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BOWMAN PLATING CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8550

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTEFAN LAURO

Defendant

BOWMAN PLATING CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

BARBER JOHN L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

5/1/2023: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

4/24/2023: Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/24/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order - ORDER RE: JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INCS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

4/24/2023: Order - ORDER RE: JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INCS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS CLASS COMPLAINT

4/24/2023: Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS CLASS COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; HEARING ON MOTION TO...)

4/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; HEARING ON MOTION TO...)

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF'S INDIVIDUAL AND CLASS CLAIMS

4/19/2023: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF'S INDIVIDUAL AND CLASS CLAIMS

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS

4/18/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS

4/7/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF'S INDIVIDUAL AND CLASS CLAIMS

4/7/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF'S INDIVIDUAL AND CLASS CLAIMS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SHIVA RAZIPOUR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

3/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SHIVA RAZIPOUR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Motion to Consolidate - DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS FOR ALL PURPOSES

3/8/2023: Motion to Consolidate - DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS FOR ALL PURPOSES

Request for Judicial Notice - JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

3/8/2023: Request for Judicial Notice - JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/8/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/8/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHIVA RAZIPOUR IN SUPPORT OF BOWMAN PLATINGS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHIVA RAZIPOUR IN SUPPORT OF BOWMAN PLATINGS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRAD SIMPSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRAD SIMPSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFANS INDIVIDUAL AND CLASS CLAIMS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN

3/7/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFANS INDIVIDUAL AND CLASS CLAIMS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Defendant Bowman Plating, Co., Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Lauro Estefans Individual and Class Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities: Filed By: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 04/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Defendant Bowman Plating, Co., Inc.s Motion to Consolidate Related Actions for All Purposes: Filed By: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 04/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Defendant Bowman Plating, Co., Inc.s Motion to Consolidate Related Actions for All Purposes: Result Date changed from 04/24/2023 to 04/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOrder Re: Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Bowman Plating, Co., Incs Motion to Consolidate; Signed and Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Lauro Estefan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Defendant Bowman Plating Co., Inc.s Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs Class Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Lauro Estefan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Defendant Bowman Plating Co., Inc.s Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs Class Complaint: Filed By: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date changed from 04/24/2023 to 04/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOrder Re: Defendant Bowman Plating, Co., Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate; Signed and Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Lauro Estefan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lauro Estefan (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Highberger in Department 10 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lauro Estefan (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lauro Estefan (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less