This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2023 at 00:59:44 (UTC).

LAURO ESTEFAN VS BOWMAN PLATING CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 LAURO ESTEFAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BOWMAN PLATING CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8550

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTEFAN LAURO

Defendant

BOWMAN PLATING CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

BARBER JOHN L.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SHIVA RAZIPOUR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

3/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SHIVA RAZIPOUR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Motion to Consolidate - DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS FOR ALL PURPOSES

3/8/2023: Motion to Consolidate - DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS FOR ALL PURPOSES

Request for Judicial Notice - JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

3/8/2023: Request for Judicial Notice - JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/8/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/8/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHIVA RAZIPOUR IN SUPPORT OF BOWMAN PLATINGS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHIVA RAZIPOUR IN SUPPORT OF BOWMAN PLATINGS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRAD SIMPSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRAD SIMPSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFANS INDIVIDUAL AND CLASS CLAIMS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN

3/7/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF LAURO ESTEFANS INDIVIDUAL AND CLASS CLAIMS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN

Exhibit List - COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

3/7/2023: Exhibit List - COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BOWMAN PLATING, CO., INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/8/2023: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

2/1/2023: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

1/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 01/20/2023

1/20/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 01/20/2023

Notice of Related Case

1/6/2023: Notice of Related Case

Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND COMPLEX DETERMINATION

11/9/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Substitution of Attorney

11/3/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDefendant Bowman Plating, Co., Inc.s Motion to Consolidate Related Actions for All Purposes; Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Shiva Razipour In Support of Defendant Bowman Plating, Co., Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Lauro Estefan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketJudicial Notice in Support of Defendant Bowman Plating, Co., Inc.s Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Lauro Estefan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDefendant Bowman Plating, Co., Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff Lauro Estefans Individual and Class Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Lauro Estefan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCompendium of Exhibits in Support of Defendant Bowman Plating, Co., Inc.s Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Shiva Razipour in Support of Bowman Platings Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lauro Estefan (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Highberger in Department 10 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lauro Estefan (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lauro Estefan (Plaintiff); As to: Bowman Plating Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less