This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/31/2019 at 15:08:29 (UTC).

LAURIE LEVINSON VS RONY RAMOS ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 LAURIE LEVINSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RONY RAMOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6513

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LEVINSON LAURIE

Defendants and Respondents

RAMOS RONY

GOLD POINT TRANSPORTATION INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PIERRY & MCADAMS LLP

PIERRY THOMAS JAMES

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CLARK HILL LLP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/20/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

11/1/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 11/01/2019

11/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 11/01/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

11/1/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/15/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/22/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

10/1/2019: Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT)

10/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT)

NOTICE OF LIEN OF LIEN CLAIMANTS, SSA CONTAINERS, INC. AND HOMEPORT INSURANCE COMPANY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF DARLENE WILBANKS IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/28/2018: NOTICE OF LIEN OF LIEN CLAIMANTS, SSA CONTAINERS, INC. AND HOMEPORT INSURANCE COMPANY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF DARLENE WILBANKS IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Proof of Service -

7/2/2018: Proof of Service -

DEFENDANT RONY RAMOS AND COLD POINT TRANSPORTATION, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF LAURIE LEVINSON'S COMPLAINT

6/8/2018: DEFENDANT RONY RAMOS AND COLD POINT TRANSPORTATION, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF LAURIE LEVINSON'S COMPLAINT

SUMMONS -

5/17/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

5/17/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Laurie Levinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docketat 4:15 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 11/01/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Laurie Levinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketMotion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Filed by Rony Ramos (Defendant); Gold Point Transportation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Laurie Levinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIEN OF LIEN CLAIMANTS, SSA CONTAINERS, INC. AND HOMEPORT INSURANCE COMPANY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF DARLENE WILBANKS IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Laurie Levinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT RONY RAMOS AND COLD POINT TRANSPORTATION, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF LAURIE LEVINSON'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rony Ramos (Defendant); Gold Point Transportation, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Laurie Levinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706513    Hearing Date: October 25, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

On May 17, 2018, plaintiff Laurie Levinson (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendants Rony Ramos and Gold Point Transportation Inc. (“Defendants”) for injuries arising from an automobile collision that occurred while Plaintiff was working as an employee for SSA Terminals. Defendants filed an answer on June 8, 2018. Defendants deposed Plaintiff on May 29, 2019, during which Plaintiff testified as the potential liability of SSA Marine, Inc. dba Pacific Marine Terminal (“Proposed Cross-Defendant”) in owning, maintaining, supervising, operating or controlling the premises on which the collision occurred. Defendants now seek leave to file a cross-complaint against Proposed Cross-Defendant for indemnification, contribution, apportionment of fault, and declaratory relief.

A party shall file a cross-complaint against any of the parties who filed the complaint or cross-complaint against him or her before or at the same time as the answer to the complaint or cross-complaint. (Code Civ. Proc. § 428.50, subd. (a).) Any other cross-complaint may be filed at any time before the court has set a date for trial. (Code Civ. Proc., § 428.50, subd. (b).) A party shall obtain leave of court to file any cross-complaint except one filed within the time specified in subdivision (a) or (b). Leave may be granted in the interest of justice at any time during the course of the action. (Code Civ. Proc., § 428.50, subd. (c).)

Defendants attached a proposed cross-complaint to its motion and have demonstrated that leave to file a cross-complaint is in the interest of justice because the issues of indemnity and contribution stem from the same collision as the one at issue in the complaint. Accordingly, Defendants’ motion is GRANTED and Defendants are ordered to file their cross-complaint within 10 days of the date of this order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.