This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2023 at 10:29:10 (UTC).

LAURIE LEE TORNCELLO, ET AL. VS ISRAEL RAMON GOMEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 LAURIE LEE TORNCELLO, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ISRAEL RAMON GOMEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8898

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHICO JOSE

TORNCELLO LAURIE LEE

Defendants

GOMEZ ISRAEL RAMON

KNIGHT-SWIFT TRANSPORTATION HOLDINGS INC.

SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO. OF ARIZONA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES ROSANN GILLAND

Defendant Attorney

HERZOG VANESSA KATHRYN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

7/20/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

7/21/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Request for Dismissal

6/24/2022: Request for Dismissal

Answer

6/14/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/6/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/11/2022: Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

3/11/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/11/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/11/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/11/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2025
  • Hearing03/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • Hearing09/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • Hearing08/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 01/23/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY; Signed and Filed by: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Defendant); As to: Laurie Lee Torncello (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY: Filed By: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Rejected to Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Laurie Lee Torncello, et al. on 03/11/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Laurie Lee Torncello and Jose Chico as to Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Laurie Lee Torncello (Plaintiff); Jose Chico (Plaintiff); As to: Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Israel Ramon Gomez (Defendant); Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Defendant); As to: Laurie Lee Torncello (Plaintiff); Jose Chico (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Laurie Lee Torncello (Plaintiff); Jose Chico (Plaintiff); As to: Israel Ramon Gomez (Defendant); Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Defendant); Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Laurie Lee Torncello (Plaintiff); Jose Chico (Plaintiff); As to: Israel Ramon Gomez (Defendant); Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Defendant); Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Laurie Lee Torncello (Plaintiff); Jose Chico (Plaintiff); As to: Israel Ramon Gomez (Defendant); Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC (Defendant); Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KNIGHT-SWIFT TRANSPORTATION HOLDING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZOG VANESSA K.