This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 13:32:43 (UTC).

LAURIE KIMBERLY HUNTER, ET AL. VS VENICE NAVARETTE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 LAURIE KIMBERLY HUNTER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VENICE NAVARETTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1557

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUNTER LAURIE KIMBERLY

TIEDEMANN ROBERT LESLIE

Defendants

AHUMADA AMBER DENISE

MARINA BIKE RENTALS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROWSON TERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POCRASS JAMES LOUIS

Defendant Attorneys

FARAZIAN TINA

BREMER KEITH G.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

6/30/2021: Answer

PI General Order

6/22/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

9/23/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR VENICE

9/23/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR VENICE

Answer

9/13/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/13/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2024
  • Hearing06/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Venice); Filed by VENICE NAVARETTE (Defendant); AMBER DENISE AHUMADA (Defendant); TERESA ROWSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by VENICE NAVARETTE (Defendant); AMBER DENISE AHUMADA (Defendant); TERESA ROWSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by VENICE NAVARETTE (Defendant); AMBER DENISE AHUMADA (Defendant); TERESA ROWSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by VENICE NAVARETTE (Defendant); AMBER DENISE AHUMADA (Defendant); TERESA ROWSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LAURIE KIMBERLY HUNTER (Plaintiff); ROBERT LESLIE TIEDEMANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LAURIE KIMBERLY HUNTER (Plaintiff); ROBERT LESLIE TIEDEMANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MARINA BIKE RENTALS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LAURIE KIMBERLY HUNTER (Plaintiff); ROBERT LESLIE TIEDEMANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LAURIE KIMBERLY HUNTER (Plaintiff); ROBERT LESLIE TIEDEMANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LAURIE KIMBERLY HUNTER (Plaintiff); ROBERT LESLIE TIEDEMANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LAURIE KIMBERLY HUNTER (Plaintiff); ROBERT LESLIE TIEDEMANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POCRASS JAMES L.