This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 00:06:52 (UTC).

LAURIE COHEN, ET AL. VS WHITE GLOVE LOGISTICS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 LAURIE COHEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WHITE GLOVE LOGISTICS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2546

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COHEN LAURIE

COHEN MARK

Defendants

ELBYR WAIEL LUCA

WHITE GLOVE LOGISTICS INC. DBA LUCA'S LOGISTICS A CORPORATION;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHALEN DANIEL CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

6/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

6/25/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2024
  • Hearing06/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • Hearing12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LAURIE COHEN (Plaintiff); MARK COHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LAURIE COHEN (Plaintiff); MARK COHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LAURIE COHEN (Plaintiff); MARK COHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LAURIE COHEN (Plaintiff); MARK COHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LAURIE COHEN (Plaintiff); MARK COHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHALEN DANIEL C.