This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 20:43:51 (UTC).

LAURENT SLUTZKY VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 LAURENT SLUTZKY filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5022

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SLUTZKY LAURENT

Defendants

LAD V LLC DBA AUDI DOWNTOWN LA

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIN SHARON

Defendant Attorneys

LEACH BRIAN E.

GRECO ANTHONY P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/3/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/3/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/3/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/3/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT LAD-AU, LLC D/B/A AUDI DOWNTOWN LAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

12/8/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT LAD-AU, LLC D/B/A AUDI DOWNTOWN LAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Answer

12/16/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • Hearing05/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (Defendant); As to: Laurent Slutzky (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer DEFENDANT LAD-AU, LLC D/B/A AUDI DOWNTOWN LAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed by: LAD-AU, LLC d/b/a AUDI DOWNTOWN LA Erroneously Sued As LAD V LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Laurent Slutzky (Plaintiff); As to: LAD V LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 11/08/2022; Service Cost: 111.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Laurent Slutzky (Plaintiff); As to: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 11/07/2022; Service Cost: 174.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Laurent Slutzky (Plaintiff); As to: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (Defendant); LAD V LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Laurent Slutzky (Plaintiff); As to: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Laurent Slutzky (Plaintiff); As to: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Malcolm Mackey in Department 55 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less