This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 02:21:16 (UTC).

LAURENT , IDOR VS LAURENT , LONEZE DUMAS

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 LAURENT , IDOR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LAURENT , LONEZE DUMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MACKENZIE, ALISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2802

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MACKENZIE, ALISON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAURENT IDOR

Respondent

LAURENT LONEZE DUMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LEVINE CHRISTIANA DANIELLE

LEVINE KENZIE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail

7/5/2022: Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail

Request - Continue Hearing

7/8/2022: Request - Continue Hearing

Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing

7/11/2022: Order on Request to Reschedule Hearing

Minute Order

5/13/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service of Summons

5/10/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

5/12/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/12/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration to Request for Order

5/12/2022: Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration to Request for Order

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

5/12/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

5/2/2022: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

5/3/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

FCS-Mediation Memo

5/4/2022: FCS-Mediation Memo

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/15/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support

3/15/2022: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

3/15/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support

3/15/2022: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support

Summons

3/15/2022: Summons

Declaration - Income and Expense

3/15/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • Hearing07/27/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department 88 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; RFO - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Reschedule Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketRequest - Continue Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service - Mail ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 88, MacKenzie, Alison, Presiding; RFO - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation (Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketResponsive Declaration (Responsive Declaration to Request for Order ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (Declaration - Income and Expense ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE KENZIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE CHRISTIANA DANIELLE MACKENZIE