This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2022 at 14:03:28 (UTC).

LAUREN RANK, ET AL. VS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 LAUREN RANK, filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1686

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RANK LAUREN

Defendants

STOCKMAN M.D. JOEL

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

WU M.D. JAMES

YEH M.D. MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS DREW N

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

9/29/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

9/22/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Complaint

9/22/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lauren Rank (Plaintiff); Lauren Rank (Plaintiff); Nathan Rank (Plaintiff); Aiden Rank (Plaintiff); As to: The Regents of The University of California (Defendant); Michael Yeh, M.D. (Defendant); James Wu, M.D. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Nathan Rank (Plaintiff),Lauren Rank (Plaintiff),Aiden Rank (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Result Date changed from 09/29/2022 to 09/29/2022; As To Parties changed from Michael Yeh, M.D. (Defendant), Joel Stockman, M.D. (Defendant), James Wu, M.D. (Defendant), The Regents of The University of California (Defendant) to James Wu, M.D. (Defendant), Michael Yeh, M.D. (Defendant), Joel Stockman, M.D. (Defendant), The Regents of The University of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Lauren Rank (Plaintiff); Nathan Rank (Plaintiff); Aiden Rank (Plaintiff); As to: The Regents of The University of California (Defendant); Michael Yeh, M.D. (Defendant); James Wu, M.D. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: As To Parties changed from Joel Stockman, M.D. (Defendant), The Regents of The University of California (Defendant), Michael Yeh, M.D. (Defendant), James Wu, M.D. (Defendant) to Michael Yeh, M.D. (Defendant), James Wu, M.D. (Defendant), The Regents of The University of California (Defendant), Joel Stockman, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lauren Rank (Plaintiff); Nathan Rank (Plaintiff); Aiden Rank (Plaintiff); As to: The Regents of The University of California (Defendant); Michael Yeh, M.D. (Defendant); James Wu, M.D. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lauren Rank (Plaintiff); Nathan Rank (Plaintiff); Aiden Rank (Plaintiff); As to: The Regents of The University of California (Defendant); Michael Yeh, M.D. (Defendant); James Wu, M.D. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Lauren Rank (Plaintiff); Nathan Rank (Plaintiff); Aiden Rank (Plaintiff); As to: The Regents of The University of California (Defendant); Michael Yeh, M.D. (Defendant); James Wu, M.D. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS DREW N.