This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2020 at 15:25:32 (UTC).

LAUREN MINSTER VS IVANA PRINCE ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 LAUREN MINSTER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IVANA PRINCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6178

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MINISTER LAUREN A DISABLED ADULT

Defendants and Respondents

PRINCE IVANA

DOES 1 TO 50

PRINCE WILLIAM

Guardian Ad Litem

MINSTER LISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KESSLER ALAN J. ESQ.

PALEY ROBIN E.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ARMSTRONG ROBERT W. ESQ.

MIRBACK DAVID J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

7/30/2019: Notice of Related Case

COMPLAINT FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

6/22/2017: COMPLAINT FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

7/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 07/12/2019

7/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 07/12/2019

Declaration - DECLARATION ADDENDUM TO DECLARATION ALAN KESSLER RE OSC AUG. 19, 2019 (NOT NAME EXT)

8/13/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION ADDENDUM TO DECLARATION ALAN KESSLER RE OSC AUG. 19, 2019 (NOT NAME EXT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) RE: DISMISSAL ...)

8/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) RE: DISMISSAL ...)

Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust

12/16/2019: Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) RE: DISMISSAL ...)

12/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) RE: DISMISSAL ...)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

12/6/2018: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) re: Dismissal ...)

2/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) re: Dismissal ...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE OSC RE DISMISSAL

5/10/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE OSC RE DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) RE: DISMISSAL ...)

5/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) RE: DISMISSAL ...)

PROOF OF SERVICE STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

1/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/31/2018: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

9/27/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

SUMMONS -

10/19/2017: SUMMONS -

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM--CIVIL

7/20/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM--CIVIL

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. NEGLIGENCE 3. NEGLIGENCE. 4. CIVIL CONSPIRACY 5. FALSE IMPRISONMENT 6. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

9/27/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. NEGLIGENCE 3. NEGLIGENCE. 4. CIVIL CONSPIRACY 5. FALSE IMPRISONMENT 6. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • Hearing01/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Hearing01/14/2020 at 13:30 PM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Leave petition for order establishing special needs trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Hearing01/14/2020 at 13:30 PM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (reDismissal Date) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) re: Dismissal ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust; Filed by Lauren, a disabled adult Minister (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketPetition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim; Filed by Lauren, a disabled adult Minister (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) re: Dismissal ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Lisa Minster (Legacy Party); Lauren, a disabled adult Minister (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM--CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lauren, a disabled adult Minister (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC666178    Hearing Date: January 14, 2020    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

LAUREN MINISTER,

Plaintiff,

v.

IVANA PRINCE, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC666178

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Sam Minister (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Lauren Minister (“Claimant”). Petitioner proposes to invest $285,000 in a single-payer deferred annuity, and $157,126.60 in a special needs trust. The Court has the following concerns:

1. The Court does not have sufficient information concerning Claimant’s ongoing care needs to determine whether this is appropriate. In other words, Petitioner should provide information concerning whether the portion in the special needs trust will cover Claimant’s ongoing needs, since the amount in the single-payer annuity may not be accessed easily.

2. The Court is concerned that placing this annuity in Claimant’s name may deprive her of government benefits (e.g., Social Security and MediCal benefits). The Court is concerned that placing this annuity in someone else’s name would mean that the Court would not have oversight over Claimant’s settlement. Therefore, the Court would like Petitioner to address this concern.

The Court continues this hearing to January 24, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. to afford Petitioner an opportunity to address these issues. Petitioner may file a supplemental declaration in advance of the hearing. Petitioner shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: January 9, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court