Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 03:32:19 (UTC).

LAUREN JOY SAND VS OLYMPIA FINANCIAL MORTGAGE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 LAUREN JOY SAND filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OLYMPIA FINANCIAL MORTGAGE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0521

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAND LAUREN JOY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ARONSON JEFF

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY

OLYMPIA FINANCIAL MORTGAGE INC.

GOLDEN WEST ESCROW INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

GOLDEN WEST ESCROW INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHTER SCOTT M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LEFF ANDREW L.

VEIGUELA PETER

HALFORD MORGAN M.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

VEIGUELA PETER

HALFORD MORGAN M.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

2/22/2021: Case Management Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

2/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

2/4/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

2/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

2/1/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

2/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/28/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY TO THE COMPLAINT

12/14/2020: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY TO THE COMPLAINT

Answer

12/1/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

12/1/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/26/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • Hearing03/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Hearing02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Lauren Joy Sand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Lauren Joy Sand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Fidelity National Title Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Olympia Financial Mortgage, Inc. (Defendant); Jeff Aronson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Fidelity National Title Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Golden West Escrow, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer (OF DEFENDANT FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY TO THE COMPLAINT); Filed by Fidelity National Title Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by Golden West Escrow, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Golden West Escrow, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Golden West Escrow, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Scott M. Richter (Attorney); Lauren Joy Sand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Scott M. Richter (Attorney); Lauren Joy Sand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lauren Joy Sand (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN WEST ESCROW INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where OLYMPIA FINANCIAL MORTGAGE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Michael Richter