This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 01:14:28 (UTC).

LAUREN CHASE VS KALNEL GARDENS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 LAUREN CHASE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KALNEL GARDENS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6444

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHASE LAUREN

Defendant

KALNEL GARDENS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLENER JOSEPH W.

Defendant Attorneys

CARRON PAUL A.

CARRON PAUL ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/7/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/4/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/16/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Demand for Jury Trial

1/11/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

1/11/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE]

6/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE

6/9/2021: Order - ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE

Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

6/9/2021: Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/7/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • Hearing08/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Paul A. Carron (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Case Management Order, Order Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketOrder (Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kalnel Gardens LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Kalnel Gardens LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kalnel Gardens LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Kalnel Gardens LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lauren Chase (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lauren Chase (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lauren Chase (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KALNEL GARDENS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARRON PAUL A. ESQ.