This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2020 at 20:45:53 (UTC).

LAUREN CELINSKI VS ONE HUNDRED TOWERS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 LAUREN CELINSKI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ONE HUNDRED TOWERS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8410

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CELINSKI LAUREN

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

ABLE BUILDING MAINTENANCE CO.

ONE HUNDRED TOWERS LLC

CBRE GWS REA; ESTATE SERVICES INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

CROWN BUILDING MAINTENANCE CO.

CBRE INC

ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED

ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BENJI DANIEL ESQ.

BENJI DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

TYSON ROBERT F. JR. ESQ.

PARMINTER STEVEN R. ESQ.

HURLEY ALISON K.

SMITH JEFFREY A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

1/17/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

1/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 01/17/2020

1/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 01/17/2020

Request for Judicial Notice

8/14/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/26/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/17/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Informal Discovery Conference

1/29/2019: Informal Discovery Conference

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

1/29/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

1/29/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

Separate Statement - Separate Statement In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel

10/12/2018: Separate Statement - Separate Statement In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel

Answer

11/15/2018: Answer

Motion to Compel - Further Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One

10/12/2018: Motion to Compel - Further Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

10/1/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/9/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/10/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT CBRE, INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF LAUREN CELINSKI'S COMPLAINT

7/10/2018: DEFENDANT CBRE, INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF LAUREN CELINSKI'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 631(B) AND DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL

7/19/2018: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 631(B) AND DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lauren Celinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docketat 2:37 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Lauren Celinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of settlement) of 01/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Re Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by ABM Industries Incorporated - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lauren Celinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lauren Celinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lauren Celinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lauren Celinski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC708410    Hearing Date: October 31, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Spring Street Courthouse, Department 5

lauren Celinski ,

Plaintiff,

v.

one hundred towers, llc, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC708410

Hearing Date: October 31, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Defendant AMB Industries Incorporated (“Defendant”) moves for summary judgment on the complaint of Plaintiff Lauren Celinski (“Plaintiff”). Defendant proffers evidence that it did not own or control the premises at issue and did not perform safety inspections or repairs of the fixture that caused Plaintiff’s injury, satisfying its burden on summary judgment. Plaintiff has filed a notice of non-opposition to the motion. Accordingly, the Court grants the motion. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: October 31, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court