This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 08:31:51 (UTC).

LAUREENE BUCK VS B.M.A. USA, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 LAUREENE BUCK filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against B M A USA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5972

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUCK LAUREENE

Defendant

B.M.A. USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOX DAVE

FOX JOANNA LEE

VASQUEZ COURTNEY MICHELLE

Defendant Attorneys

HAMBLY MICHAEL ROBERT

SALMAS GEORGE CONSTANTIN

SHIPOW MARK STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION

2/3/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/31/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF DISMISSAL, REQUEST FOR STAY, AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

11/16/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF DISMISSAL, REQUEST FOR STAY, AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Joint Status Conference Report

11/15/2022: Joint Status Conference Report

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK SHIPOW IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF DISMISSAL, REQUEST FOR STAY, AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

11/8/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK SHIPOW IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF DISMISSAL, REQUEST FOR STAY, AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COURTNEY M. VASQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF DISMISSAL, REQUEST FOR STAY, AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

11/8/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COURTNEY M. VASQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF DISMISSAL, REQUEST FOR STAY, AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Unknown - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY

9/30/2022: Unknown - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO LIFT DISCOVERY...)

9/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO LIFT DISCOVERY...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK S. SHIPOW IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY

9/27/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK S. SHIPOW IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY

Ex Parte Application - PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF COURTNEY VASQUEZ

9/27/2022: Ex Parte Application - PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF COURTNEY VASQUEZ

Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING SET FOR 9/20/22

9/19/2022: Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING SET FOR 9/20/22

Initial Status Conference Report

9/13/2022: Initial Status Conference Report

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT B.M.A. USA, INC.

6/28/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT B.M.A. USA, INC.

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

6/22/2022: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/21/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/21/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Initial Status Conference Order

6/7/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of Action: Exact Name changed from Stipulation and Order For Dismissal Of Action to Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of Action ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order For Dismissal Of Action: Status Date changed from 02/03/2023 to 02/03/2023 ; Exact Name changed from Stipulation And [Proposed] Order For Dismissal Of Action to Stipulation and Order For Dismissal Of Action ; Result Date changed from 02/03/2023 to 02/03/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Laureene Buck on 05/12/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice, causes as to putative class

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Laureene Buck on 05/12/2022, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice, causes Plaintiff's individual action against BMA USA, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketStipulation And [Proposed] Order For Dismissal Of Action; Signed and Filed by: Laureene Buck (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation And [Proposed] Order For Dismissal Of Action: Filed By: Laureene Buck (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 02/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Joanna Lee Fox (Attorney); Courtney Michelle Vasquez (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 1 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Laureene Buck (Plaintiff); As to: B.M.A. USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Laureene Buck (Plaintiff); As to: B.M.A. USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Laureene Buck (Plaintiff); As to: B.M.A. USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less