This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2022 at 12:55:04 (UTC).

LAURA SCHLISMANN VS SHERI ELBAUM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 LAURA SCHLISMANN filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against SHERI ELBAUM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1559

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHLISMANN LAURA

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

ELBAUM SHERI

MOUNT SINAI MEMORIAL PARKS AND MORTUARIES A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

SINAI TEMPLE A CALIFORNIA NON PROFIT

Cross Defendant

SINAI TEMPLE OF LOS ANGELES DBA MOUNT SINAI MEMORIAL PARKS AND MORTUARIES A CALIFORNIA NON PROFIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCUS GERALD LEE

Defendant Attorney

HITCH DAVE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/13/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/13/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/13/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/13/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/13/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/13/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/13/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

2/22/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

2/22/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

2/22/2022: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/6/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2025
  • Hearing01/09/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • Hearing07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • Hearing06/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Sheri Elbaum (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sheri Elbaum (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Sheri Elbaum (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Sheri Elbaum (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Sheri Elbaum (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sheri Elbaum (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Laura Schlismann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Laura Schlismann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Laura Schlismann (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUS GERALD LEE