This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 15:28:31 (UTC).

LAURA RAMOS VS PLANNED PARENTHOOD LOS ANGELES,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 LAURA RAMOS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PLANNED PARENTHOOD LOS ANGELES,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICIA D. NIETO and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6381

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICIA D. NIETO

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS LAURA

Defendants

DELGADO FERNANDO

CUEVAS CARMEN

PLANNED PARENTHOOD LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAZERKANIAN JACK

Defendant Attorney

BELL MARGARET

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; (PROPOSED) ORDER

12/8/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; (PROPOSED) ORDER

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/8/2022: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE

4/8/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE

Notice of Continuance

4/13/2022: Notice of Continuance

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/13/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

4/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Exhibit List

4/14/2022: Exhibit List

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

5/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

5/12/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT)

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

6/27/2022: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

6/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 06/30/2022

6/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 06/30/2022

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JACK BAZERKANIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/30/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JACK BAZERKANIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement

3/30/2022: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PLANNED PARENTHOOD LOS ANGELES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

3/30/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PLANNED PARENTHOOD LOS ANGELES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Response - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS

3/30/2022: Response - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RACHEL RODRIGUEZ

1/28/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RACHEL RODRIGUEZ

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • Hearing07/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • Hearing06/29/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 06/29/2023 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/10/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation to Continue Trial; (Proposed) Order; Signed and Filed by: Planned Parenthood Los Angeles (Defendant); As to: Laura Ramos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Summary Judgment: Filed By: Planned Parenthood Los Angeles (Defendant); Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: 06/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/30/2022: Status Date changed from 06/30/2022 to 06/30/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/30/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI); Signed and Filed by: Laura Ramos (Plaintiff); Planned Parenthood Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Laura Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Planned Parenthood Los Angeles (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/28/2020; Service Cost: 113.40; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAddress for Jack Bazerkanian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Planned Parenthood Los Angeles (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Planned Parenthood Los Angeles, to Planned Parenthood Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Patricia D. Nieto in Department 24 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Laura Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Planned Parenthood Los Angeles, (Defendant); Fernando Delgado (Defendant); Carmen Cuevas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Laura Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Planned Parenthood Los Angeles, (Defendant); Fernando Delgado (Defendant); Carmen Cuevas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Laura Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Planned Parenthood Los Angeles, (Defendant); Fernando Delgado (Defendant); Carmen Cuevas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less