This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 16:59:34 (UTC).

LAURA KAUFMAN, ET AL. VS CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 LAURA KAUFMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1313

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KAUFMAN KATRINA

KAUFMAN LAURA

KAUFMAN MICHAEL

Defendants

CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARTZ MARK R.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/30/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/30/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/30/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2024
  • Hearing06/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2023
  • Hearing12/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2023
  • Hearing12/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Laura Kaufman (Plaintiff); Michael Kaufman (Plaintiff); Katrina Kaufman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Laura Kaufman (Plaintiff); Michael Kaufman (Plaintiff); Katrina Kaufman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Laura Kaufman (Plaintiff); Michael Kaufman (Plaintiff); Katrina Kaufman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARTZ MARK R. ESQ.