This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2020 at 20:29:58 (UTC).

LAURA DAY VS RANDAL D HAWORTH

Case Summary

On 01/18/2017 LAURA DAY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against RANDAL D HAWORTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU and BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7089

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE LU

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAY LAURA

Defendants

HAWORTH. M.D. RANDAL D.

ROXBURY CLINIC AND SURGICAL CENTER INC.

HAWORTH RANDAL D. M.D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RUDD CHRISTOPHER L. ESQ.

RUDD LAW FIRM. THE

RUDD CHRISTOPHER L.

Attorney at The Rudd Law Firm

15233 Ventura Blvd Ste 320

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

JANNOL HENRY

WESTER REBECCA DENA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GONZALEZ MICHAEL D. ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael D. Gonzalez

101 N. Brand Blvd., Suite 1880

Glendale,, CA 91203

GONZALEZ MICHAEL

GONZALEZ MICHAEL D.

ARABIAN HAIG

 

Court Documents

Notice - Notice Notice of Scheduling Informal Discovery Conference

1/22/2019: Notice - Notice Notice of Scheduling Informal Discovery Conference

Notice - Notice Notice of Cancelling IDC 2.26.19

2/11/2019: Notice - Notice Notice of Cancelling IDC 2.26.19

Substitution of Attorney

1/29/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction)

1/16/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction) of 01/16/2019

1/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction) of 01/16/2019

Objection - DEFENDANT RANDAL D. HAWORTH, M.D.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BRENDA ("TESS") BROUSSARD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF' NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDAN

1/2/2019: Objection - DEFENDANT RANDAL D. HAWORTH, M.D.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BRENDA ("TESS") BROUSSARD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF' NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDAN

Objection - DEFENDANT RANDAL D. HAWORTH, M.D.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF MONICA BERLIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT RANDAL D.

1/2/2019: Objection - DEFENDANT RANDAL D. HAWORTH, M.D.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF MONICA BERLIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT RANDAL D.

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HAIG ARABIAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION

1/2/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HAIG ARABIAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION

Objection - DEFENDANT RANDAL D. HAWORTH, M.D.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF LAURA DAY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT RANDAL D. HAW

1/2/2019: Objection - DEFENDANT RANDAL D. HAWORTH, M.D.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF LAURA DAY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT RANDAL D. HAW

Opposition - OPPOSITION (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/2/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/2/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/9/2019: Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/9/2019: Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) FIRS...)

7/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) FIRS...)

Amended Complaint

9/6/2019: Amended Complaint

Answer

9/16/2019: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/19/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department M; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference ((7-10 day estimate)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Randal D. Haworth, M.D (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Laura Day (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Laura Day (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Randal D. Haworth, M.D (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by Laura Day (Plaintiff); Laura Day (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketAMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Laura Day (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR:MEDICAL MALPRACTICE, BREACH OF CONTRACT, BREACH OF WARRANTY, MEDICAL BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

MICHAEL D. GONZALEZ [SBN 115684] FILED HAIG ARABIAN [SBN 289861] Superior Court of California

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL D. GONZALEZ County of Los Angeles 101 North Brand Boulevard, Suite 1880 Glendale, CA 91203 APR 13 2018

Telephone (818) 844-0188

Facsimile (818) 844-0181 Sherri R. Carter, Executixe Officer/Clerk By..zz_m. Deputy

Attorneys for Defendant, Moses Soto RANDAL D. HAWORTH, M.D.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

- LAURA DAY, CASE NO. BC647089 Plaintitt, | Assigned to Department "97" the Honorable Elaine Lu, Judge Presiding] VS. . Complaint Filed: 01/18/17 RANDAL D. HAWORTH, and DOE 1 through Trial Date: 07/18/18 DOE 10, inclusive, Defendants. OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RANDAL

D. HAWORTH, M.D., TO PLAINTIFE’S

MOTION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED

COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF

POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Date: April 27,2018 Time: 1:30 p.m. Dept.: ¥977

TO ALL PARTIES AND THEIR RESPECTIVE ATTORNEYS OF RECORDS:

Defendant, RANDAL D. HAWORTH, M.D., submits the following Memorandum of Points and Authorities, in OPPOSITION to the motion of Plaintift, LAURA DAY, for leave to amend and file a First Amended Complaint.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUDD CHRISTOPHER LEE