This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2022 at 06:01:05 (UTC).

LAUNI KING, ET AL. VS AVNER MANZOOR MANDEL, M.D., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 LAUNI KING, filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against AVNER MANZOOR MANDEL, M D ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8360

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KING CARLOS FELIPE

KING LAUNI

Defendants

MANDEL AVNER MANZOOR M.D.

WOMEN'S HEALTH AND FERTILITY CENTER OF BEVERLY HILLS

THE CENTER FOR SURGERY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANDWEIN STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

CLARK BRADLEY C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/2/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/16/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

4/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/6/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/17/2020: Answer

Answer

6/1/2020: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/24/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/10/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

1/12/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

12/29/2021: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Avner Manzoor Mandel, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Launi King (Plaintiff); Carlos Felipe King (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Avner Manzoor Mandel, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by The Center for Surgery (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Center for Surgery (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Avner Manzoor Mandel, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Launi King (Plaintiff); Carlos Felipe King (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Launi King (Plaintiff); Carlos Felipe King (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Launi King (Plaintiff); Carlos Felipe King (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Launi King (Plaintiff); Carlos Felipe King (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Launi King (Plaintiff); Carlos Felipe King (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Launi King (Plaintiff); Carlos Felipe King (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less