This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 14:19:25 (UTC).

LATOYA MORENO VS STUDIO 6 COMMERCE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 LATOYA MORENO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STUDIO 6 COMMERCE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6906

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO LATOYA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BATELL MANAGER

STUDIO 6 COMMERCE

STUDIO 6 LA LLC

STUDIO 6 MOTEL

Cross Defendant

ARAIZA CARMEN CASTILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOMINGO MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

BROUSES BERNADETTE CASTILLO

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

5/23/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

5/23/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/23/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/24/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/24/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/24/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/24/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

10/3/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/3/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/3/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/14/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2024
  • Hearing05/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2023
  • Hearing11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketRequest FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Filed by: Anmol, LLC Erroneously Sued As Studio 6 Motel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Anmol, LLC Erroneously Sued As Studio 6 Motel (Cross-Complainant); As to: Carmen Castillo Araiza (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketSummons Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anmol, LLC Erroneously Sued As Studio 6 Motel (Defendant); As to: Carmen Castillo Araiza (Defendant on defendant's claim)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Studio 6 Motel (Defendant); As to: Latoya Moreno (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Studio 6 Motel (Defendant); As to: Latoya Moreno (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Anmol, LLC Erroneously Sued As Studio 6 Motel (Defendant); As to: Carmen Castillo Araiza (Defendant on defendant's claim)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Latoya Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Studio 6 LA, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/21/2022; Service Cost: 201.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Latoya Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Studio 6 Commerce (Defendant); Manager Batell (Defendant); Studio 6 LA, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Latoya Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Studio 6 Commerce (Defendant); Manager Batell (Defendant); Studio 6 LA, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less