This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 14:36:45 (UTC).

LATEISHA FERRELL VS FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 LATEISHA FERRELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS, INC , INDIVIDUALLY AND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0161

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERRELL LATEISHA

Defendants

MONTES SHERRY

FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA FOOD 4 LESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAZIRI SIAMAK

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/12/2021: Answer

PI General Order

6/11/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

6/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

5/28/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/28/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2024
  • Hearing05/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Food 4 Less of California, Inc. dba Food 4 Less Erroneously Sued As FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LATEISHA FERRELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LATEISHA FERRELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LATEISHA FERRELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by LATEISHA FERRELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LATEISHA FERRELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LATEISHA FERRELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant