This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2020 at 20:45:04 (UTC).

LATASHA GEORGE VS MICKEY BEARMAN COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/09/2018 LATASHA GEORGE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MICKEY BEARMAN COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY KEOSIAN and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1303

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY KEOSIAN

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Respondents and Cross Defendants

GEORGE LATASHA

BEARMAN MICHAEL

DOES 1 TO 50

MICKEY BEARMAN COMPANY

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Appellants

BEARMAN MICHAEL

MICKEY BEARMAN COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Defendant Attorney

SEPLOW MICHAEL D. ESQ.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KULIK GOTTESMAN SIEGAL & WARE LLP

15303 Ventura Blvd. Suite 1400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403-1611

KULIK GLEN L.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

7/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice on Hearing About Court Fees - NOTICE ON HEARING ABOUT COURT FEES HEARING SET FOR 01/16/20

12/31/2019: Notice on Hearing About Court Fees - NOTICE ON HEARING ABOUT COURT FEES HEARING SET FOR 01/16/20

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

1/2/2020: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

1/3/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

1/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

12/18/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

12/19/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Stipulation - No Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND ALL OTHER PROCEEDINGS PENDING DEFENDANTS' APPEAL OF THE ANTI-SLAPP ORDER

6/7/2019: Stipulation - No Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND ALL OTHER PROCEEDINGS PENDING DEFENDANTS' APPEAL OF THE ANTI-SLAPP ORDER

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET 2)

3/11/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET 2)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION, FURTHER STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE, SANCTIONS

3/11/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION, FURTHER STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE, SANCTIONS

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

2/20/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Objection - Objection Cross-Defendant's Evidentiary Objections and {Proposed] Orders Thereon

2/11/2019: Objection - Objection Cross-Defendant's Evidentiary Objections and {Proposed] Orders Thereon

Opposition - Opposition Opposition to Anti-Slapp

2/5/2019: Opposition - Opposition Opposition to Anti-Slapp

Answer - Answer to Cross-Complaint

1/11/2019: Answer - Answer to Cross-Complaint

Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

1/11/2019: Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

Notice of Continuance - Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference

11/6/2018: Notice of Continuance - Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference

Notice - Notice of errata

10/19/2018: Notice - Notice of errata

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/19/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

160 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • Hearing11/09/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B298219); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketObjection (TO MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ON APPEAL); Filed by Mickey Bearman Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketMemorandum (of Cost on Appeal); Filed by Latasha George (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Mickey Bearman Company (Defendant); Michael Bearman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
237 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Latasha George (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. HARASSMENT AND DISCRIMINATION BASED ON SEX, RACE, DISABILITY AND/OR VETERAN STATUS (CAL. GOV'T CODE 12940(A) AND (K)) ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Latasha George (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701303    Hearing Date: November 13, 2019    Dept: 61

Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. (“CCP”) section 284 states that “[t]he attorney in an action or special proceeding may be changed at any time before or after judgment or final determination” upon either consent of both client and attorney, or upon the order of the court under application of either the client of the attorney, after notice from one to the other. Cal. Rule of Court 3.1362 states the requirements for a motion to be relieved as counsel under CCP section 284. No memorandum is required, but the motion must be accompanied by (1) a declaration stating why a motion has been brought instead of filing a consent (without compromising attorney-client confidentiality), (2) proof of service of the motion, and (3) all hearing dates scheduled in the action or proceeding, including the date of trial, if know. Additionally, “[t]he proposed order relieving counsel must be prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel--Civil (form MC-053) and must be lodged with the court with the moving papers.”

The present motion pertains to Attorney Attorney Michael D. Seplow of the firm Schonbrun Seplow Harris & Hoffman LLP, counsel for Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Latasha George. The motions comply with the above requirements.

George has filed an Objection to Application on Completion of Limited Scope Representation, asking leave to present evidence in camera and outside the presence of her counsel to preserve the attorney-client privilege.

The court will consider the objections George offers during hearing on the motion. Pending hearing, the court’s tentative decision is that Attorney Michael D. Seplow of Schonbrun Seplow Harris & Hoffman LLP’s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Latasha George is GRANTED.