This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 16:04:08 (UTC).

LARRY SEAL VS GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 LARRY SEAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6209

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMALFITANO GAIL

ARROYO HECTOR

BOAGES TYRELL

BOGER CHRISTOPHER

BOYD CARMEN

CALLAWAY BENITA

CHAMBERS BRENDA

COE GOLDA

DANIELS TOWANDA

DANZY JAMAL

DAVIS VENUS

DELMAS ROBERT

FEIST TAMIKA

FELDER JAMAL

FOMBY OSCAR

GOINES OLIVER

GREENSLATE TAD

GULLEY LEE

HADAWAY NENA

Defendant

GILEAD SCIENCES INC.

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUTHERFORD JACK

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Larry Seal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Larry Seal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Larry Seal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant