This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 08:27:08 (UTC).

LARRY M BAKMAN, ET AL. VS ARASH ALBERT AHDOOT

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 LARRY M BAKMAN, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARASH ALBERT AHDOOT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1431

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

BAKMAN LARRY M

LARRY M. BAKMAN A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

AHDOOT ARASH ALBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALIN GARRY S

Defendant Attorney

SIGELMAN PAUL S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/25/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/12/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/2/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Cross-Complaint

12/19/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

12/19/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Arash Albert Ahdoot (Defendant); As to: Larry M Bakman (Plaintiff); Larry M. Bakman, A Professional Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Arash Albert Ahdoot (Defendant); As to: Larry M Bakman (Plaintiff); Larry M. Bakman, A Professional Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Larry M Bakman (Plaintiff); Larry M. Bakman, A Professional Law Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Arash Albert Ahdoot (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/17/2022; Service Cost: 800.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/27/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Craig D. Karlan in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/27/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Larry M Bakman (Plaintiff); Larry M. Bakman, A Professional Law Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Arash Albert Ahdoot (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Larry M Bakman (Plaintiff); Larry M. Bakman, A Professional Law Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Arash Albert Ahdoot (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Larry M Bakman (Plaintiff); Larry M. Bakman, A Professional Law Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Arash Albert Ahdoot (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Malin, Garry S