This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2019 at 01:30:38 (UTC).

LARRY KLINE VS RON RENAUD

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 LARRY KLINE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RON RENAUD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6573

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KLINE LARRY

LARRY KLINE AS TRUSTEE OF THE JEFFREY R. PRETTYMAN FAMILY TRUST

PAYDAY INC.

Defendants

RENAUD RON

PDEI INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHEELER DAVID CARROLL

Attorney at Senior Counsel, Inc.

2625 Townsgate Road Suite 330

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Defendant Attorney

ARMSTRONG JAMES J.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Reconsideration - MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION BY DEFS. PURSUANT TO 1008 C.C.P. TO THE RULING AND THE MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/03/2019

10/15/2019: Motion for Reconsideration - MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION BY DEFS. PURSUANT TO 1008 C.C.P. TO THE RULING AND THE MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/03/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) THE ...)

10/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) THE ...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE VIENNA NGUYEN, CSR#13137

10/3/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE VIENNA NGUYEN, CSR#13137

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

9/25/2019: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Request for Judicial Notice

9/26/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ERRATUM RE FILING OF MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

9/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ERRATUM RE FILING OF MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Reply - REPLY REPLY BY THE DEF'S TO THE MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO A DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF'S; A REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; A DECLARATION OF DAVID L. BARG; DECLARATION OF JAMES J. AR

9/26/2019: Reply - REPLY REPLY BY THE DEF'S TO THE MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO A DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF'S; A REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; A DECLARATION OF DAVID L. BARG; DECLARATION OF JAMES J. AR

Order - ORDER RE COURT'S WRITTEN ORDER ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY, DEMURRER, MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS HEARING HELD 6/14/19

6/21/2019: Order - ORDER RE COURT'S WRITTEN ORDER ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY, DEMURRER, MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS HEARING HELD 6/14/19

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/25/2019

6/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/25/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Reply - REPLY BY DEFENDANT TO MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

6/11/2019: Reply - REPLY BY DEFENDANT TO MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

6/3/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

Motion to Disqualify Counsel

5/22/2019: Motion to Disqualify Counsel

Motion for Sanctions

5/23/2019: Motion for Sanctions

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY, ETC.

5/13/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY, ETC.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/29/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Reply - REPLY ERRATA TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER & MOTION TO STRIKE

5/2/2019: Reply - REPLY ERRATA TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER & MOTION TO STRIKE

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Larry Kline, as Trustee of the Jeffrey R. Prettyman Family Trust (Plaintiff); Payday, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNotice ( OF CONTINUANCE OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE FROM 12-05-19 TO 01-07-20); Filed by Larry Kline, as Trustee of the Jeffrey R. Prettyman Family Trust (Plaintiff); Payday, Inc. (Plaintiff); Ron Renaud (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketMotion for Reconsideration (by Defs. pursuant to 1008 C.C.P. to the Ruling and the Minute Order dated 10/03/2019); Filed by Ron Renaud (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketObjection ( TO REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL, ETC.); Filed by Ron Renaud (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketReply (in Support of Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Declaration of Michael C. Mosher; Supplemental Declaration of David C. Wheeler); Filed by Larry Kline, as Trustee of the Jeffrey R. Prettyman Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketObjection (OBJECTIONS, ETC., TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES, ETC.); Filed by Ron Renaud (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (the First Amended Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Vienna Nguyen, CSR#13137); Filed by Larry Kline, as Trustee of the Jeffrey R. Prettyman Family Trust (Plaintiff); Payday, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Ron Renaud (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by Ron Renaud (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Larry Kline, as Trustee of the Jeffrey R. Prettyman Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Larry Kline, as Trustee of the Jeffrey R. Prettyman Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Larry Kline, as Trustee of the Jeffrey R. Prettyman Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint (1st); Filed by Larry Kline, as Trustee of the Jeffrey R. Prettyman Family Trust (Plaintiff); Payday, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Payday, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHEELER DAVID C. ESQ.