This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2022 at 06:51:58 (UTC).

LARRY BAKMAN VS GERALDO ALVES

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 LARRY BAKMAN filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against GERALDO ALVES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0463

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BAKMAN LARRY

Respondent

ALVES GERALDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MALIN GARRY S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - PETITION FOR REJECTION OF AWARD AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL DE NOVO

9/26/2022: Petition - PETITION FOR REJECTION OF AWARD AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL DE NOVO

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

9/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

10/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Larry Bakman (Petitioner); As to: Geraldo Alves (Respondent); Service Date: 10/07/2022; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark H. Epstein in Department R Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketPetition for Rejection of Award and Request for Trial De Novo; Filed by: Larry Bakman (Petitioner); As to: Geraldo Alves (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Larry Bakman (Petitioner); As to: Geraldo Alves (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Larry Bakman (Petitioner); As to: Geraldo Alves (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Malin, Garry S