This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 11:50:34 (UTC).

LARKINS, COLLIN VS PONTAK, SIERRA

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 LARKINS, COLLIN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against PONTAK, SIERRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COHEN, LAURA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7267

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COHEN, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LARKINS COLLIN

Respondent

PONTAK SIERRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

12/27/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order

12/27/2021: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

12/27/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

12/27/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Proof of Service

1/12/2022: Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Mail - re: DV-115 / DV-116

1/14/2022: Proof of Service - Mail - re: DV-115 / DV-116

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

1/18/2022: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/18/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

1/18/2022: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Minute Order

1/18/2022: Minute Order

Exhibit List - Exhibit List (Comment)

3/22/2022: Exhibit List - Exhibit List (Comment)

Witness List - Witness List (Comment)

3/22/2022: Witness List - Witness List (Comment)

Minute Order

3/29/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/29/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

3/29/2022: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

12/27/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • Hearing12/27/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketWitness List (Witness List (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketExhibit List (Exhibit List (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (re: DV-115 / DV-116 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice - Continuance (No Fee); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketProposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE