Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:51:09 (UTC).

LARISSA HARDIN VS HRAYR SHAHINIAN M D ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 LARISSA HARDIN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HRAYR SHAHINIAN M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL, MARC D. GROSS and MICHAEL J. CONVEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7388

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

MARC D. GROSS

MICHAEL J. CONVEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HARDIN LARISSA

Defendants and Respondents

SKULL BASE INSTITUTE

DOES 1-20

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

SKULL BASE FOUNDATION

BILLING ROSE

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC.

SHAHINIAN HRAYR M.D.

DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

QUINN KEVIN F. ESQ.

QUINN KEVIN FREDERICK

Defendant Attorney

LEE TINA E

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/25/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Related Case

11/7/2018: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

4/10/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

4/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

6/7/2019: Minute Order

DEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/8/2018: DEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/8/2018: DEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order

4/24/2018: Minute Order

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/26/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE: NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION

4/18/2018: NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE: NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Notice of Related Cases

4/10/2018: Notice of Related Cases

Minute Order

4/5/2018: Minute Order

SUMMONS

3/9/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

3/9/2018: COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Conference (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Michael J. Convey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Michael J. Convey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 12:25 PM in Department U, Michael J. Convey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases) of 04/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Larissa Hardin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Larissa Hardin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE: NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 309; Court Order (Court Order; Case Determined to be non-Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Larissa Hardin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC A CALIFORNIA... is a litigant

Latest cases where SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SKULL BASE INSTITUTE is a litigant